AL SB18 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-23 - Assigned Act No. 2016-112.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-23 - Assigned Act No. 2016-112.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Hearing Instrument Dealers, definitions revised, fees to be determined by rule of board, testing of applicants revised, Sec. 34-14-34 added; Secs. 34-14-1 to 34-14-9, inclusive, 34-14-11, 34-14-30, 34-14-32, 34-14-33 am'd.
Title
Hearing Instrument Dealers, definitions revised, fees to be determined by rule of board, testing of applicants revised, Sec. 34-14-34 added; Secs. 34-14-1 to 34-14-9, inclusive, 34-14-11, 34-14-30, 34-14-32, 34-14-33 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-22 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-23 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2016-112. |
2016-03-23 | House | Signature Requested |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Enrolled |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2016-03-22 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 338 |
2016-03-22 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2016-03-03 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2016-02-23 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Boards, Agencies and Commissions |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 181 |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Health and Human Services |