AL SB18 | 2015 | 1st Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 7 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-07 - Assigned Act No. 2015-507.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Lincoln, corp. limits alt., police jurisdiction not to be extended by any annexation

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Lincoln, corp. limits alt., police jurisdiction not to be extended by any annexation

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-08-07 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 61 Abs: 28) [FAIL]
2015-08-05 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2015-08-05 - Senate - McClendon motion to Adopt (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 12) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-08-07SenateAssigned Act No. 2015-507.
2015-08-07HouseSignature Requested
2015-08-07SenateEnrolled
2015-08-07SenatePassed Second House
2015-08-07HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 32
2015-08-07HouseThird Reading Passed
2015-08-06HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2015-08-05HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation
2015-08-05SenateEngrossed
2015-08-05SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 21
2015-08-05SenateMcClendon motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 20
2015-08-05SenateLocal Legislation Amendment Offered
2015-08-05SenateThird Reading Passed
2015-08-04SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2015-08-03SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback