AL SB18 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-05 - Pending third reading on day 22 Favorable from Education Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-05 - Pending third reading on day 22 Favorable from Education Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Schools, allow school district to educate students about traditional winter celebrations and offer traditional greetings
Title
Schools, allow school district to educate students about traditional winter celebrations and offer traditional greetings
Sponsors
Sen. Gerald Allen [R] | Sen. Arthur Orr [R] | Sen. J.T. Waggoner [R] | Sen. Rusty Glover [R] |
Sen. Bill Hightower [R] | Sen. Jerry Fielding [D] | Sen. Greg Reed [R] | Sen. Del Marsh [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-14 - Senate - Ross motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-14 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 22 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-02-14 - Senate - Ross motion to Adopt (Y: 10 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [FAIL]
2014-02-14 - Senate - Allen motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-02-14 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 22 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-02-14 - Senate - Ross motion to Adopt (Y: 10 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [FAIL]
2014-02-14 - Senate - Allen motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-05 | House | Pending third reading on day 22 Favorable from Education Policy |
2014-03-05 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2014-02-13 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Education Policy |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Engrossed |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 390 |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Ross motion to Adopt lost Roll Call 389 |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Holley motion to Reconsider Ross Amendment No. 2 adoption vote adopted Voice Vote . |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Ross motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 388 |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Ross Amendment No. 2 Offered. |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Allen motion to Table adopted Voice Vote |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Ross Amendment Offered |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Allen motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 384 |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Judiciary first Substitute Offered |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Allen motion to Table adopted Voice Vote |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Judiciary Amendment Offered |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and 1 amendment |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary |