AL SB179 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-22 - Pending third reading on day 24 Favorable from Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-22 - Pending third reading on day 24 Favorable from Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Jefferson Co., judges, circuit or district, temporary assignment, prohibiting Chief Justice of the Supreme Court from assigning circuit or district judge to serve within another judicial circuit, Secs. 12-9A-7, 12-9A-8 am'd.
Title
Jefferson Co., judges, circuit or district, temporary assignment, prohibiting Chief Justice of the Supreme Court from assigning circuit or district judge to serve within another judicial circuit, Secs. 12-9A-7, 12-9A-8 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-02 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-22 | House | Pending third reading on day 24 Favorable from Judiciary |
2019-05-22 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-05-02 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 570 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary |