AL SB179 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-20 - Pending third reading on day 20 Favorable from Education Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-20 - Pending third reading on day 20 Favorable from Education Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Public schools, grant all professional educators' associations same level of access to employees of public schools
Title
Public schools, grant all professional educators' associations same level of access to employees of public schools
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-06 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-20 | House | Pending third reading on day 20 Favorable from Education Policy |
2017-04-20 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2017-04-06 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Education Policy |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 482 |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Education and Youth Affairs |