AL SB179 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-26 - Assigned Act No. 2015-281.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-26 - Assigned Act No. 2015-281.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Education budget, appropriations for the support, maintenance, and development of public education
Title
Education budget, appropriations for the support, maintenance, and development of public education
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-26 - House - Poole motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-05-21 - Senate - Pittman motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-05-21 - Senate - Pittman to suspend Joint Rule 21 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-05-21 - House - Poole motion to Accede (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-05-21 - Senate - Marsh motion to Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-05-21 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-21 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-05-21 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-05-21 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-05-21 - House - Poole motion to Table (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-05-21 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-05-21 - Senate - Pittman motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-05-21 - Senate - Pittman to suspend Joint Rule 21 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-05-21 - House - Poole motion to Accede (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-05-21 - Senate - Marsh motion to Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-05-21 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-21 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-05-21 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-05-21 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-05-21 - House - Poole motion to Table (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-05-21 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-26 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2015-281. |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Enrolled |
2015-05-26 | House | Signature Requested |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Concurred in Conference Report |
2015-05-26 | House | Sessions intended to vote "Yea" |
2015-05-26 | House | Poole motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1026 |
2015-05-26 | House | Poole motion to Previous Question adopted Roll Call 1025 |
2015-05-26 | House | Poole motion in writing adopted |
2015-05-26 | House | Conference Report Concurrence Requested |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Pittman motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1150 |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Conference Committee on SB179 2015RS first Substitute Offered |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Conference Report |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Pittman to suspend Joint Rule 21 adopted Roll Call 1149. |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Pittman to suspend Joint Rule 21 |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Conference Committee Appointed |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Marsh motion to Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee adopted Roll Call 1108 P&PO appoints Pittman, Ross and Marsh |
2015-05-21 | House | Conference Committee Requested |
2015-05-21 | House | Poole motion to Accede adopted Roll Call 960 House appoints Poole, McMillan and Scott |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Concurrence Requested |
2015-05-21 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 944 |
2015-05-21 | House | Williams (JD) motion to Withdraw adopted Voice Vote |
2015-05-21 | House | Williams (JD) Amendment Offered |
2015-05-21 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 943 |
2015-05-21 | House | Poole Amendment Offered |
2015-05-21 | House | Poole motion to Table adopted Roll Call 942 |
2015-05-21 | House | Ways and Means Education Amendment #2 Offered |
2015-05-21 | House | Poole motion to Table adopted Roll Call 941 |
2015-05-21 | House | Ways and Means Education Amendment #1 Offered |
2015-05-21 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 940 |
2015-05-21 | House | Ways and Means Education first Substitute Offered |
2015-05-21 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2015-05-19 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and 2 amendments |
2015-04-16 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Engrossed |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Pittman motion to Reconsider and Table adopted Voice Vote |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 444 |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 443 |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Pittman first Substitute Offered |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Pittman motion to Table adopted Voice Vote |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Finance and Taxation Education first Substitute Offered |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation Education |