AL SB179 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-01 - Forwarded to Executive Department
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-01 - Forwarded to Executive Department
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Security transfer of securities and security accounts, Sec. 8-6-140 am'd
Title
Security transfer of securities and security accounts, Sec. 8-6-140 am'd
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-26 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2012-04-20 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-04-20 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-01 | Forwarded to Executive Department | |
2012-05-01 | Assigned Act No. 2012-296. | |
2012-05-01 | Signature Requested | |
2012-05-01 | Enrolled | |
2012-04-26 | Passed Second House | |
2012-04-26 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1055 | |
2012-04-26 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-04-24 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2012-04-19 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Financial Services | |
2012-04-19 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 709 | |
2012-04-19 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-02-21 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2012-02-07 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Banking and Insurance |