AL SB178 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-15 - Pending third reading on day 24 Favorable from Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-15 - Pending third reading on day 24 Favorable from Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Parole, Board of Pardons and Paroles, violations, confinement period for parole violation reduced for time served in holding, Sec. 15-22-32 am'd.
Title
Parole, Board of Pardons and Paroles, violations, confinement period for parole violation reduced for time served in holding, Sec. 15-22-32 am'd.
Sponsors
Sen. Linda Coleman-Madison [D] | Sen. Vivian Figures [D] | Sen. Bobby Singleton [D] | Sen. Rodger Smitherman [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-11 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 529 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - Senate - SBIR: Coleman-Madison motion to Adopt Roll Call 528 (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - Senate - SBIR: Coleman-Madison motion to Adopt Roll Call 528 (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-15 | House | Pending third reading on day 24 Favorable from Judiciary |
2021-04-15 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2021-03-11 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 529 |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary |