AL SB177 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-13 - Assigned Act No. 2018-264.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Children First Trust Fund, appropriations from for fiscal year ending September 30, 2019, use of allocation pursuant to Section 41-15B-2.2 and this act, tobacco settlement revenues deposited in fund within 30 days of receipt, Finance Director to notify each agency of allocation, appropriations conditional on tobacco revenues, appropriation of additional tobacco settlement funds, audit, Children's Affairs Department to report to Legislature and Children's Policy Council, appropriations from General Fund to various entities

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Children First Trust Fund, appropriations from for fiscal year ending September 30, 2019, use of allocation pursuant to Section 41-15B-2.2 and this act, tobacco settlement revenues deposited in fund within 30 days of receipt, Finance Director to notify each agency of allocation, appropriations conditional on tobacco revenues, appropriation of additional tobacco settlement funds, audit, Children's Affairs Department to report to Legislature and Children's Policy Council, appropriations from General Fund to various entities

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-13 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-13SenateAssigned Act No. 2018-264.
2018-03-13HouseSignature Requested
2018-03-13SenateEnrolled
2018-03-13SenatePassed Second House
2018-03-13HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 725
2018-03-13HouseThird Reading Passed
2018-03-08HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2018-02-20HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means General Fund
2018-02-20SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 439
2018-02-20SenateThird Reading Passed
2018-02-15SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2018-01-16SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback