AL SB176 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-13 - Assigned Act No. 2018-263.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-13 - Assigned Act No. 2018-263.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Coalition Against Domestic Violence, appropriation, operations plan and audited financial statement required, quarterly and end-of-year reports required
Title
Coalition Against Domestic Violence, appropriation, operations plan and audited financial statement required, quarterly and end-of-year reports required
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-13 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - Senate - Allen motion to Adopt (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - Senate - Allen motion to Adopt (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-13 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2018-263. |
2018-03-13 | House | Signature Requested |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Enrolled |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2018-03-13 | House | Givan intended to vote "Yea" |
2018-03-13 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 723 |
2018-03-13 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2018-03-08 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2018-02-20 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means General Fund |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 437 |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund |