AL SB174 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-20 - Assigned Act No. 2014-277.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Marijuana, Carly's law, unlawful possession of, affirmative defense for possession for use to treat a person with an epileptic condition under certain conditions, research and development study by and prescription provided by University of Alabama-Birmingham, Department of Neurology

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Marijuana, Carly's law, unlawful possession of, affirmative defense for possession for use to treat a person with an epileptic condition under certain conditions, research and development study by and prescription provided by University of Alabama-Birmingham, Department of Neurology

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-03-20 - Senate - Marsh motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-03-19 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-03-19 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - Senate - Sanford motion to Adopt (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - Senate - Sanford motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - Senate - Sanford motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-03-20HouseAssigned Act No. 2014-277.
2014-03-20HouseSignature Requested
2014-03-20SenateEnrolled
2014-03-20HouseConcurred in Second House Amendment
2014-03-20SenateMarsh motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 978
2014-03-20SenateConcurrence Requested
2014-03-20HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 932
2014-03-20HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 931
2014-03-20HouseFarley Amendment Offered
2014-03-20HouseThird Reading Passed
2014-03-18HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2014-03-13HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Technology and Research
2014-03-13SenateEngrossed
2014-03-11SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 765
2014-03-11SenateSanford motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 764
2014-03-11SenateSanford Amendment No. 2 Offered.
2014-03-11SenateSanford motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 763
2014-03-11SenateSanford Amendment Offered
2014-03-11SenateSanford motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 762
2014-03-11SenateSanford first Substitute Offered
2014-03-11SenateSanford motion to Table adopted Voice Vote
2014-03-11SenateJudiciary first Substitute Offered
2014-03-11SenateThird Reading Passed
2014-02-06SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and
2014-01-14SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/SESSBillResult.ASPX?WIN_TYPE=BillResult&BILL=SB174
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2014RS/PrintFiles/SB174-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2014RS/PrintFiles/SB174-eng.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2014RS/PrintFiles/SB174-enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=493018&VOTE=762&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1062&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=493024&VOTE=763&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1062&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=493032&VOTE=764&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1062&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=493035&VOTE=765&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1062&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=496706&VOTE=931&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1062&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=496707&VOTE=932&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1062&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=497110&VOTE=978&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1062&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback