AL SB174 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-20 - Delivered to Governor at 7:02 p.m. on May 20, 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Wrestling, regulation by Alabama Athletic Commission, act renamed as Alabama Boxing, Wrestling, and Mixed Martial Arts Act,, Secs. 41-9-1020, 41-9-1021,41-9-1022, 41-9-1023, 41-9-1024, 41-9-1025, 41-9-1027, 41-9-1028, 41-9-1029, 41-9-1030, 41-9-1031, 41-9-1032, 41-9-1033, 41-9-1034, 41-9-1035, 41-9-1036, 41-9-1037, 41-9-1038 am'd

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Wrestling, regulation by Alabama Athletic Commission, act renamed as Alabama Boxing, Wrestling, and Mixed Martial Arts Act,, Secs. 41-9-1020, 41-9-1021,41-9-1022, 41-9-1023, 41-9-1024, 41-9-1025, 41-9-1027, 41-9-1028, 41-9-1029, 41-9-1030, 41-9-1031, 41-9-1032, 41-9-1033, 41-9-1034, 41-9-1035, 41-9-1036, 41-9-1037, 41-9-1038 am'd

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-05-20 - Senate - Marsh motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-05-07 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-05-07 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-05-07 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-05-07 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-04-12 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-04-12 - Senate - Allen motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-20HouseDelivered to Governor at 7:02 p.m. on May 20, 2013
2013-05-20HouseAssigned Act No. 2013-285.
2013-05-20HouseSignature Requested
2013-05-20SenateEnrolled
2013-05-20HouseConcurred in Second House Amendment
2013-05-20SenateMarsh motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1040
2013-05-20SenateConcurrence Requested
2013-05-07HouseDeMarco intended to vote "Yea"
2013-05-07HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1135
2013-05-07HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1134
2013-05-07HouseRobinson (O) Amendment Offered
2013-05-07HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1133
2013-05-07HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1132
2013-05-07HouseBoards, Agencies and Commissions Amendment #2 Offered
2013-05-07HouseBoards, Agencies and Commissions Amendment #1 Offered
2013-05-07HouseThird Reading Passed
2013-04-24HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 2 amendments
2013-04-16HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Boards, Agencies and Commissions
2013-04-16SenateEngrossed
2013-04-11SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 420
2013-04-11SenateAllen motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 419
2013-04-11SenateGovernmental Affairs Amendment Offered
2013-04-11SenateThird Reading Passed
2013-02-21SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2013-02-12SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/SESSBillResult.ASPX?WIN_TYPE=BillResult&BILL=SB174
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2013RS/PrintFiles/SB174-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2013RS/PrintFiles/SB174-eng.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2013RS/PrintFiles/SB174-enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=464964&VOTE=419&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1061&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=464965&VOTE=420&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1061&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=473646&VOTE=1132&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1061&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=473647&VOTE=1133&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1061&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=473649&VOTE=1134&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1061&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=473660&VOTE=1135&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1061&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=475720&VOTE=1040&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1061&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback