AL SB173 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-03 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-03 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Peace Officers' Annuity and Benefit Fund, calculation of benefits, manner of, fees adjusted per recommendation of actuary, Secs. 36-21-68, 36-21-73 am'd.
Title
Peace Officers' Annuity and Benefit Fund, calculation of benefits, manner of, fees adjusted per recommendation of actuary, Secs. 36-21-68, 36-21-73 am'd.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-03 | Senate | Indefinitely Postponed |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Holley motion to Carry Over adopted Voice Vote |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading Carried Over |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Holley motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Reported from Governmental Affairs as Favorable |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs |