AL SB172 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 4 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-04 - State Government first Amendment Offered
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on May 4 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-04 - State Government first Amendment Offered
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Law Enforcement Agency, drivers' license office, operational in each county a minimum of two days each week
Title
Law Enforcement Agency, drivers' license office, operational in each county a minimum of two days each week
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-04 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 99 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - House - McCampbell motion to Table (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2016-03-15 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 24 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - House - McCampbell motion to Table (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2016-03-15 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 24 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-04 | House | State Government first Amendment Offered |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Forwarded to Governor on May 4, 2016 at 11:59 p.m. on May 4, 2016 |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Enrolled |
2016-05-04 | House | Signature Requested |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2016-05-04 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 899 |
2016-05-04 | House | McCampbell motion to Table adopted Roll Call 898 |
2016-05-04 | House | State Government Amendment Offered |
2016-05-04 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2016-04-20 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2016-03-15 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on State Government |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 374 |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund |