AL SB172 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-4)
Status: Passed on May 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-20 - Delivered to Governor at 7:02 p.m. on May 20, 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-4)
Status: Passed on May 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-20 - Delivered to Governor at 7:02 p.m. on May 20, 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Private Investigation Board, established, licensing and regulation of private investigators, members, terms, powers, vacancies, subject to Administrative Procedure Act, civil and criminal penalties, Private Investigators Licensing and Regulatory Act
Title
Private Investigation Board, established, licensing and regulation of private investigators, members, terms, powers, vacancies, subject to Administrative Procedure Act, civil and criminal penalties, Private Investigators Licensing and Regulatory Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-22 - Senate - Bedford motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 26 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-05-07 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-05-07 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 99 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-05-07 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-05-07 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 90 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2013-04-11 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 17 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2013-04-11 - Senate - Holtzclaw motion to Adopt (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2013-05-07 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-05-07 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 99 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-05-07 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-05-07 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 90 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2013-04-11 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 17 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2013-04-11 - Senate - Holtzclaw motion to Adopt (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-20 | Senate | Delivered to Governor at 7:02 p.m. on May 20, 2013 |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2013-306. |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Enrolled |
2013-05-20 | House | Signature Requested |
2013-05-20 | House | Concurred in Second House Amendment |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Bedford motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1043 |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Concurrence Requested |
2013-05-07 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1109 |
2013-05-07 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1108 |
2013-05-07 | House | Boards, Agencies and Commissions Amendment #3 Offered |
2013-05-07 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1107 |
2013-05-07 | House | Boards, Agencies and Commissions Amendment #2 Offered |
2013-05-07 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1106 |
2013-05-07 | House | Boards, Agencies and Commissions Amendment #1 Offered |
2013-05-07 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2013-04-24 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 3 amendments |
2013-04-16 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Boards, Agencies and Commissions |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Engrossed |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 403 |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Holtzclaw motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 402 |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Governmental Affairs Amendment Offered |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs |