AL SB171 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-15 - Pending third reading on day 13 Favorable from Boards, Agencies and Commissions
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-15 - Pending third reading on day 13 Favorable from Boards, Agencies and Commissions
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Engineers and Land Surveyors, legislative intent regarding rule-making authority of Board of Licensure for provided regarding antitrust laws, Sec. 34-11-35.1 added
Title
Engineers and Land Surveyors, legislative intent regarding rule-making authority of Board of Licensure for provided regarding antitrust laws, Sec. 34-11-35.1 added
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-07 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-15 | House | Pending third reading on day 13 Favorable from Boards, Agencies and Commissions |
2017-03-15 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2017-03-07 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Boards, Agencies and Commissions |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 236 |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development |