AL SB17 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on January 30 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-01-30 - Delivered to Governor at 3:29 p.m. on 1/30/18
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Alabama Family Trust Corporation, compliance with federal Social Security law and rules, provisions for successor life beneficiary deleted, disbursement of remainder including reimbursement for medical assistance, trust not to affect Medicaid approps, Secs. 38-9B-2, 38-9B-3, 38-9B-5 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Alabama Family Trust Corporation, compliance with federal Social Security law and rules, provisions for successor life beneficiary deleted, disbursement of remainder including reimbursement for medical assistance, trust not to affect Medicaid approps, Secs. 38-9B-2, 38-9B-3, 38-9B-5 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-01-30 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-30SenateDelivered to Governor at 3:29 p.m. on 1/30/18
2018-01-30SenateEnrolled
2018-01-30SenatePassed Second House
2018-01-30HouseSignature Requested
2018-01-30HousePermission granted
2018-01-30HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 120
2018-01-30HouseThird Reading Passed
2018-01-25HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2018-01-18HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary
2018-01-16SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 39
2018-01-16SenateThird Reading Passed
2018-01-11SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2018-01-09SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback