AL SB17 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-28 - Pending third reading on day 27 Favorable from Economic Development and Tourism
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-28 - Pending third reading on day 27 Favorable from Economic Development and Tourism
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Space, Alabama Space Authority created, Alabama Department of Economic and Community Affairs, Alabama Development Office, Alabama Department of Transportation, Governors office, Legislature, promote space exploration
Title
Space, Alabama Space Authority created, Alabama Department of Economic and Community Affairs, Alabama Development Office, Alabama Department of Transportation, Governors office, Legislature, promote space exploration
Sponsors
Sen. Gerald Dial [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-05-05 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-28 | House | Pending third reading on day 27 Favorable from Economic Development and Tourism |
2015-05-28 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2015-05-05 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Economic Development and Tourism |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 827 |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Dial motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development |