AL SB17 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-05 - Pending third reading on day 22 Favorable from County and Municipal Government
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-05 - Pending third reading on day 22 Favorable from County and Municipal Government
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Tax Assessors, Tax Collector, Co. Revenue Commissioners, supernumerary status, salary cap, co. commission may remove, Sec. 40-6-3 am'd.
Title
Tax Assessors, Tax Collector, Co. Revenue Commissioners, supernumerary status, salary cap, co. commission may remove, Sec. 40-6-3 am'd.
Sponsors
Sen. Gerald Dial [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-27 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 25 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Senate - Dial motion to Adopt (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Senate - Dial motion to Adopt (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Senate - Dial motion to Adopt (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Senate - Dial motion to Adopt (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-05 | House | Pending third reading on day 22 Favorable from County and Municipal Government |
2014-03-05 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2014-02-27 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on County and Municipal Government |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Engrossed |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 558 |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Dial motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 557 |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Dial Amendment Offered |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Dial motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 556 |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Finance and Taxation General Fund first Substitute Offered |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Taxation General Fund as Favorable with 1 substitute |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund |