AL SB169 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-22 - Further Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-22 - Further Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Injection-Associated infectious disease elimination, pilot programs by Dept. of Public Health and local health authorities authorized, limited criminal immunity granted
Title
Injection-Associated infectious disease elimination, pilot programs by Dept. of Public Health and local health authorities authorized, limited criminal immunity granted
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-22 | Senate | Further Consideration |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Singleton motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Singleton motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Health and Human Services |