AL SB167 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-20 - Delivered to Governor at 5:08 p.m. on April 20, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-20 - Delivered to Governor at 5:08 p.m. on April 20, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Wine festivals authorized, licensed by ABC Board, allow tastings and sale of wine, Sec. 28-3A-20.3 added.
Title
Wine festivals authorized, licensed by ABC Board, allow tastings and sale of wine, Sec. 28-3A-20.3 added.
Sponsors
Sen. Andrew Jones [R] | Sen. Will Barfoot [R] | Sen. Del Marsh [R] | Sen. Randy Price [R] |
Sen. Larry Stutts [R] | Sen. Thomas Whatley [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-20 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 897 (Y: 81 N: 10 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - House - HBIR: Nordgren motion to Adopt Roll Call 896 (Y: 80 N: 7 NV: 6 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 535 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - Senate - Jones motion to Adopt Roll Call 534 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - Senate - SBIR: Jones motion to Adopt Roll Call 533 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - House - HBIR: Nordgren motion to Adopt Roll Call 896 (Y: 80 N: 7 NV: 6 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 535 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - Senate - Jones motion to Adopt Roll Call 534 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - Senate - SBIR: Jones motion to Adopt Roll Call 533 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-20 | Senate | Delivered to Governor at 5:08 p.m. on April 20, 2021 |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2021-287. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Forwarded to Governor on April 20, 2021 at 5:08 p.m. on April 21, 2021 |
2021-04-20 | House | Signature Requested |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Enrolled |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2021-04-20 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 897 |
2021-04-20 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2021-04-15 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2021-03-11 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Economic Development and Tourism |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Engrossed |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 535 |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Jones motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 534 |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Jones first Substitute Offered |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Tourism |