AL SB166 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-17 - Enacted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-17 - Enacted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to municipalities; to add a new Article 3, commencing with Section 11-54B-80 to Title 11, Chapter 54B, Code of Alabama 1975, to provide that Class 3 municipalities may establish self-help business improvement districts.
Title
Relating to municipalities; to add a new Article 3, commencing with Section 11-54B-80 to Title 11, Chapter 54B, Code of Alabama 1975, to provide that Class 3 municipalities may establish self-help business improvement districts.
Sponsors
Sen. Sam Givhan [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-16 - House - Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-27 - Senate - Read A Third Time And Passed As Amended (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-04-27 - Senate - Adopt QRJT14-1 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-04-27 - Senate - Read A Third Time And Passed As Amended (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-04-27 - Senate - Adopt QRJT14-1 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-17 | Senate | Enacted |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Enrolled |
2023-05-16 | House | Ready to Enroll |
2023-05-16 | House | Read a Third Time and Pass |
2023-05-16 | House | On Third Reading in Second House |
2023-05-03 | House | Read Second Time in Second House |
2023-05-03 | House | Reported Out of Committee in Second House |
2023-05-03 | House | Reported Favorably from House Economic Development and Tourism |
2023-04-27 | House | Recommitted To CommitteeRecommitted to House Economic Development and Tourism |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Read First Time in Second House |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Read A Third Time And Passed As Amended |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Adopt QRJT14-1 |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Carry Over to the Call of the Chair |
2023-04-25 | Senate | On Third Reading in House of Origin |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Read Second Time in House of Origin |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee in House of Origin |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Reported Favorably from Senate Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Senate Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Read First Time in House of Origin |
Subjects
Economic Development and Tourism, provide Business Improvement Districts for Class 3 Municipalities.