AL SB165 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-16 - Assigned Act No. 2015-68.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-16 - Assigned Act No. 2015-68.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Prosthetists and Orthotists, Board of, regulation of practice of prosthetics, orthotics, and pedorthics, exemption of persons employed in certain facilities deleted, Sec. 34-25A-5 am'd.
Title
Prosthetists and Orthotists, Board of, regulation of practice of prosthetics, orthotics, and pedorthics, exemption of persons employed in certain facilities deleted, Sec. 34-25A-5 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-14 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-03-19 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-03-19 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-03-19 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-03-19 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-16 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2015-68. |
2015-04-16 | House | Signature Requested |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Enrolled |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2015-04-14 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 412 |
2015-04-14 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2015-04-09 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2015-03-31 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Boards, Agencies and Commissions |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 206 |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Engrossed |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 205 |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Health and Human Services Amendment Offered |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Health and Human Services |