AL SB165 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-03 - Pending third reading on day 18 Favorable from Public Safety
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-03 - Pending third reading on day 18 Favorable from Public Safety
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Motor vehicles, low speed vehicles and mini trucks, license tag category established, restrictions, certificate of title not required, safety standards, Sec. 32-6-59 added; Secs. 32-8-31, 40-12-240 am'd.; Act 2009-746, 2009 Reg. Sess. am'd. (2010-20232)
Title
Motor vehicles, low speed vehicles and mini trucks, license tag category established, restrictions, certificate of title not required, safety standards, Sec. 32-6-59 added; Secs. 32-8-31, 40-12-240 am'd.; Act 2009-746, 2009 Reg. Sess. am'd. (2010-20232)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-03 | Pending third reading on day 18 Favorable from Public Safety | |
2010-03-03 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2010-02-23 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Public Safety | |
2010-02-23 | Engrossed | |
2010-02-18 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 304 | |
2010-02-18 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 303 | |
2010-02-18 | Commerce, Transportation, and Utilities first Substitute Offered | |
2010-02-18 | Third Reading Passed | |
2010-02-04 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and | |
2010-01-12 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Commerce, Transportation, and Utilities |