AL SB164 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - Assigned Act No. 2021-349.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - Assigned Act No. 2021-349.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Consumer protection, deceptive trade practices, pyramid sales structure, further provided, Secs. 8-19-3, 8-19-5 am'd.
Title
Consumer protection, deceptive trade practices, pyramid sales structure, further provided, Secs. 8-19-3, 8-19-5 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-27 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 1037 (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - House - HBIR: Marques motion to Adopt Roll Call 1036 (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 277 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Senate - SBIR: Whatley motion to Adopt Roll Call 276 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - House - HBIR: Marques motion to Adopt Roll Call 1036 (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 277 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Senate - SBIR: Whatley motion to Adopt Roll Call 276 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-29 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2021-349. |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Enrolled |
2021-04-29 | House | Signature Requested |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2021-04-27 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1037 |
2021-04-27 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2021-03-11 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2021-02-25 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 277 |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
8 | 19 | 3 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
8 | 19 | 5 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |