AL SB163 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Assigned Act No. 2019-464.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Assigned Act No. 2019-464.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Occupational licensees, process created to allow persons convicted of crime to apply for if granted relief by court
Title
Occupational licensees, process created to allow persons convicted of crime to apply for if granted relief by court
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Ward [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-28 - Senate - Marsh motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-29 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2019-464. |
2019-05-29 | House | Signature Requested |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Enrolled |
2019-05-28 | House | Concurred in Second House Amendment |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Marsh motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1181 |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Concurrence Requested |
2019-05-23 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 927 |
2019-05-23 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 926 |
2019-05-23 | House | England Amendment Offered |
2019-05-23 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 925 |
2019-05-23 | House | Judiciary Amendment Offered |
2019-05-23 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2019-04-18 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2019-04-04 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 157 |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary |