AL SB163 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-04 - Assigned Act No. 2016-408.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Motor vehicles, distinctive plates, further provided for, Act 2015-362, 2015 Reg. Sess., am'd; Secs. 32-6-64.1, 32-6-68, 32-6-150.1, 32-6-250, 32-6-251, 32-6-630 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Motor vehicles, distinctive plates, further provided for, Act 2015-362, 2015 Reg. Sess., am'd; Secs. 32-6-64.1, 32-6-68, 32-6-150.1, 32-6-250, 32-6-251, 32-6-630 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-05-04 - Senate - Dial motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - House - Hammon motion to Previous Question (Y: 72 N: 22 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2016-03-15 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-03-15 - Senate - Dial motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-04SenateAssigned Act No. 2016-408.
2016-05-04HouseConcurred in Second House Amendment
2016-05-04HouseSignature Requested
2016-05-04SenateEnrolled
2016-05-04SenateDial motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 984
2016-05-04SenateConcurrence Requested
2016-05-04HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 856
2016-05-04HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 855
2016-05-04HouseHammon motion to Previous Question adopted Roll Call 854
2016-05-04HouseTechnology and Research Amendment Offered
2016-05-04HouseThird Reading Passed
2016-04-13HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2016-03-15HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Technology and Research
2016-03-15SenateEngrossed
2016-03-15SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 396
2016-03-15SenateDial motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 395
2016-03-15SenateTransportation and Energy first Substitute Offered
2016-03-15SenateThird Reading Passed
2016-02-25SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and
2016-02-09SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Transportation and Energy

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/SESSBillResult.ASPX?WIN_TYPE=BillResult&BILL=SB163
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2016RS/PrintFiles/SB163-int.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=540701&VOTE=395&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1065&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=540702&VOTE=396&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1065&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=552105&VOTE=854&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1065&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=552106&VOTE=855&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1065&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=552108&VOTE=856&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1065&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=552165&VOTE=984&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1065&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback