AL SB162 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-30 - Pending third reading on day 19 Favorable from Public Safety and Homeland Security with 1 amendment
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Motor vehicles, driving under the influence, fourth conviction, mandatory minimum jail time increased, prior convictions, five-year limitation deleted and convictions from other states included, driving without a license from conviction, penalty for fourth offense, penalty increased, Secs. 32-5A-191, 32-6-19 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Motor vehicles, driving under the influence, fourth conviction, mandatory minimum jail time increased, prior convictions, five-year limitation deleted and convictions from other states included, driving without a license from conviction, penalty for fourth offense, penalty increased, Secs. 32-5A-191, 32-6-19 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-04-16 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-04-16 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 26 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-16 - Senate - Orr motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-30HousePending third reading on day 19 Favorable from Public Safety and Homeland Security with 1 amendment
2015-04-30HousePublic Safety and Homeland Security first Amendment Offered
2015-04-30HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2015-04-21HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security
2015-04-21SenateEngrossed
2015-04-16SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 566
2015-04-16SenateMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 565
2015-04-16SenateOrr Amendment Offered
2015-04-16SenateThird Reading Passed
2015-04-16SenateOrr motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
2015-04-16SenateOrr motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 554
2015-04-16SenateJudiciary first Substitute Offered
2015-04-16SenateThird Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
2015-04-02SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and
2015-03-05SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback