AL SB162 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 15-5)
Status: Passed on April 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-01 - Assigned Act No. 2014-299.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Property, Alabama Uniform Partition of Heirs Property Act, created

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Property, Alabama Uniform Partition of Heirs Property Act, created

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-04-01 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - Senate - Fielding motion to Adopt (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-04-01HouseAssigned Act No. 2014-299.
2014-04-01HouseSignature Requested
2014-04-01SenateEnrolled
2014-04-01SenatePassed Second House
2014-04-01HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1022
2014-04-01HouseThird Reading Passed
2014-02-25HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2014-01-30HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary
2014-01-30SenateEngrossed
2014-01-28SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 193
2014-01-28SenateFielding motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 192
2014-01-28SenateJudiciary Amendment Offered
2014-01-28SenateThird Reading Passed
2014-01-23SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2014-01-14SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/SESSBillResult.ASPX?WIN_TYPE=BillResult&BILL=SB162
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2014RS/PrintFiles/SB162-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2014RS/PrintFiles/SB162-eng.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2014RS/PrintFiles/SB162-enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=481229&VOTE=192&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1062&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=481230&VOTE=193&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1062&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=498418&VOTE=1022&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1062&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback