AL SB162 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-09 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-09 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Motor vehicle dealers, authorized to use cell phone number on applications with Department of Revenue
Title
Motor vehicle dealers, authorized to use cell phone number on applications with Department of Revenue
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-09 | Indefinitely Postponed | |
2012-04-19 | Brooks motion to Carry Over Temporarily adopted Voice Vote | |
2012-04-19 | Third Reading Carried Over | |
2012-02-23 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2012-02-07 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary |