AL SB161 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 18-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-01 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Public works, Fair and Open Competition in Governmental Construction Act, public agencies prohibited from entering contracts and making certain awards based on collective bargaining agreements, certain terms prohibited in certain documents, exemptions

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public works, Fair and Open Competition in Governmental Construction Act, public agencies prohibited from entering contracts and making certain awards based on collective bargaining agreements, certain terms prohibited in certain documents, exemptions

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-04-01SenateIndefinitely Postponed
2014-02-13SenateSanford request unanimous consent to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair Granted.
2014-02-13SenateThird Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
2014-02-06SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2014-01-14SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Fiscal Responsibility and Accountability

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback