AL SB161 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-09 - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1183
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-09 - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1183
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Veterans' Affairs, State Department of, employees, salaries and expenses, payment from State General Fund further provided for, Sec. 31-5-14 am'd.
Title
Veterans' Affairs, State Department of, employees, salaries and expenses, payment from State General Fund further provided for, Sec. 31-5-14 am'd.
Sponsors
Sen. Gerald Dial [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-06-09 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-06-09 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-05-25 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-06-09 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-05-25 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-09 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1183 | |
2011-06-09 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1182 | |
2011-06-09 | Knight Amendment Offered | |
2011-06-09 | Third Reading Passed | |
2011-06-01 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2011-05-25 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means General Fund | |
2011-05-25 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 722 | |
2011-05-25 | Third Reading Passed | |
2011-03-31 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2011-03-08 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund |