AL SB16 | 2016 | 1st Special Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on August 15 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-08-23 - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass lost Per Section 76 of Constitution Roll Call 48
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on August 15 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-08-23 - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass lost Per Section 76 of Constitution Roll Call 48
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Class 1 municipality (B'ham), city council, salary
Title
Class 1 municipality (B'ham), city council, salary
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-08-23 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass lost Per Section 76 of Constitution Roll Call 48 (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 5 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-23 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass lost Per Section 76 of Constitution Roll Call 48 |
2016-08-23 | Senate | Lost in house of origin |
2016-08-19 | Senate | Waggoner motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote |
2016-08-19 | Senate | Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair |
2016-08-18 | Senate | Waggoner motion to Carry Over adopted Voice Vote |
2016-08-18 | Senate | Third Reading Carried Over |
2016-08-17 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2016-08-15 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation, Jefferson County |