AL SB16 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-08 - Forwarded to Governor on May 8, 2012 at 7:20 p.m. on May 8, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-08 - Forwarded to Governor on May 8, 2012 at 7:20 p.m. on May 8, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Identity theft, crime of, definition to include gaining employment through use of another person's identity, penalties increased, Sec. 13A-8-192 am'd.
Title
Identity theft, crime of, definition to include gaining employment through use of another person's identity, penalties increased, Sec. 13A-8-192 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-10 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 95 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-03-23 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-03-23 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-08 | Forwarded to Governor on May 8, 2012 at 7:20 p.m. on May 8, 2012 | |
2012-05-08 | Assigned Act No. 2012-368. | |
2012-05-08 | Enrolled | |
2012-05-08 | Signature Requested | |
2012-05-08 | Passed Second House | |
2012-05-08 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1337 | |
2012-05-08 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-04-12 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2012-03-20 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary | |
2012-03-20 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 344 | |
2012-03-20 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-02-23 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2012-02-07 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary |