AL SB159 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-06 - Enacted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-06 - Enacted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
In vitro fertilization; civil and criminal immunity for death or damage to an embryo provided to persons when providing or receiving services related to IVF
Title
In vitro fertilization; civil and criminal immunity for death or damage to an embryo provided to persons when providing or receiving services related to IVF
Sponsors
Sen. Tim Melson [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-06 - Senate - Concur In and Adopt (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-03-06 - House - Third Reading Second House (Y: 81 N: 10 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - Senate - Passed House Of Origin (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - Senate - Coleman-Madison amendment PFU3RER-1 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - Senate - Melson substitution V1YMPLL-1 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - Senate - Third Reading House of Origin (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-03-06 - House - Third Reading Second House (Y: 81 N: 10 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - Senate - Passed House Of Origin (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - Senate - Coleman-Madison amendment PFU3RER-1 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - Senate - Melson substitution V1YMPLL-1 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - Senate - Third Reading House of Origin (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-06 | Senate | Enacted |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Delivered to Governor |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Enacted |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Enrolled |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Delivered to Governor |
2024-03-06 | House | Signature Requested |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Ready to Enroll |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Reed Motion to Concur Adopted |
2024-03-06 | House | Third Reading in Second House |
2024-03-06 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Adopted Roll Call 205 |
2024-03-06 | House | Motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 204 BGDWQJQ-1 |
2024-03-06 | House | HLTH Reported Substitute Offered from House Health BGDWQJQ-1 |
2024-03-06 | House | Third Reading in Second House |
2024-03-05 | House | Committee Engrossed Substitute Adopted BGDWQJQ-1 |
2024-03-05 | House | Committee Amendment Adopted 1QXNZLZ-1 |
2024-03-05 | House | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-03-05 | House | Reported Out of Committee Second House |
2024-02-29 | House | Pending House Health |
2024-02-29 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Health |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Engrossed |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Adopted Roll Call 126 |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Coleman-Madison motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 125 PFU3RER-1 |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Coleman-Madison 2nd Amendment Offered PFU3RER-1 |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Melson motion to Table - Adopted Voice Vote ZNIZWWR-1 |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Coleman-Madison Amendment Offered ZNIZWWR-1 |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Melson motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 123 V1YMPLL-1 |
2024-02-29 | Senate | HLTH Substitute Offered V1YMPLL-1 |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Third Reading in House of Origin |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Committee Substitute Adopted V1YMPLL-1 |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee House of Origin |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Pending Senate Healthcare |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Healthcare |
Same As/Similar To
HB237 (Same As) 2024-03-05 - Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar