AL SB159 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-09 - Pending third reading on day 26 Favorable from Ways and Means Education with 1 amendment
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-09 - Pending third reading on day 26 Favorable from Ways and Means Education with 1 amendment
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Education Retirees' Trust Fund for Cost-of-Living Allowances, creation in State Treasury, investment of funds
Title
Education Retirees' Trust Fund for Cost-of-Living Allowances, creation in State Treasury, investment of funds
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-07 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Whatley motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Whatley motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-09 | House | Pending third reading on day 26 Favorable from Ways and Means Education with 1 amendment |
2017-05-09 | House | Ways and Means Education first Amendment Offered |
2017-05-09 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2017-03-09 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Engrossed |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 244 |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Whatley motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 243 |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Whatley first Substitute Offered |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Whatley motion to Table adopted Voice Vote |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Finance and Taxation Education Amendment Offered |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation Education |