AL SB159 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-04 - Assigned Act No. 2016-385.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Rescue squads, included in definition of firefighters, Secs. 36-21-101, 36-21-102, 36-30-1 to 36-30-5, inclusive, 36-30-7 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Rescue squads, included in definition of firefighters, Secs. 36-21-101, 36-21-102, 36-30-1 to 36-30-5, inclusive, 36-30-7 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-05-04 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-03-15 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-03-15 - Senate - Glover motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-04SenateAssigned Act No. 2016-385.
2016-05-04SenateEnrolled
2016-05-04HouseSignature Requested
2016-05-04SenatePassed Second House
2016-05-04HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 894
2016-05-04HouseThird Reading Passed
2016-05-04HouseMcMillan motion to Carry Over Temporarily adopted Voice Vote
2016-05-04HouseThird Reading Carried Over
2016-03-23HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2016-03-17HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education
2016-03-17SenateEngrossed
2016-03-15SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 401
2016-03-15SenateGlover motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 400
2016-03-15SenateGovernmental Affairs first Substitute Offered
2016-03-15SenateThird Reading Passed
2016-02-25SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and
2016-02-09SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback