AL SB158 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-07 - Assigned Act No. 2022-426.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-07 - Assigned Act No. 2022-426.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Lead reduction, Alabama Lead Reduction Act, lead abatement and further regulation of lead hazard reductions, Secs. 22-37A-2 to 22-37A-7, inclusive, am'd.
Title
Lead reduction, Alabama Lead Reduction Act, lead abatement and further regulation of lead hazard reductions, Secs. 22-37A-2 to 22-37A-7, inclusive, am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-07 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 1004 (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 809 (Y: 18 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - Senate - SBIR: Singleton motion to Adopt Roll Call 808 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 809 (Y: 18 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - Senate - SBIR: Singleton motion to Adopt Roll Call 808 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-07 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2022-426. |
2022-04-07 | House | Signature Requested |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Enrolled |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2022-04-07 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1004 |
2022-04-07 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2022-04-05 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2022-03-30 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means General Fund |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 809 |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
22 | 37A | 2 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
22 | 37A | 3 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
22 | 37A | 4 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
22 | 37A | 5 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
22 | 37A | 6 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
22 | 37A | 7 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |