AL SB158 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-07 - Forwarded to Governor at 5:41 p.m. on May 7, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-07 - Forwarded to Governor at 5:41 p.m. on May 7, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Children First Trust Fund, appropriations from for fiscal year ending September 30, 2021, use of allocation pursuant to Section 41-15B-2.2 and this act, tobacco settlement revenues deposited in fund within 30 days of receipt, Finance Director to notify each agency of allocation, appropriations conditional on tobacco revenues, appropriation of additional tobacco settlement funds, audit, Children's Affairs Department to report to Legislature and Children's Policy Council, appropriations from General Fund to various entities
Title
Children First Trust Fund, appropriations from for fiscal year ending September 30, 2021, use of allocation pursuant to Section 41-15B-2.2 and this act, tobacco settlement revenues deposited in fund within 30 days of receipt, Finance Director to notify each agency of allocation, appropriations conditional on tobacco revenues, appropriation of additional tobacco settlement funds, audit, Children's Affairs Department to report to Legislature and Children's Policy Council, appropriations from General Fund to various entities
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-07 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 30) [PASS]
2020-05-05 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-05-05 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-07 | Senate | Forwarded to Governor at 5:41 p.m. on May 7, 2020 |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2020-116. |
2020-05-07 | House | Signature Requested |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Enrolled |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2020-05-07 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 470 |
2020-05-07 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2020-05-06 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2020-05-05 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means General Fund |
2020-05-05 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 454 |
2020-05-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2020-05-04 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund |