AL SB158 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-06 - Assigned Act No. 2018-189.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-06 - Assigned Act No. 2018-189.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Elmore Co., sheriff, compensation, Act 2003-174, 2003 Reg. Sess., repealed
Title
Elmore Co., sheriff, compensation, Act 2003-174, 2003 Reg. Sess., repealed
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-01 - House - Ingram motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Brewbaker motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 67 Abs: 17) [FAIL]
2018-02-06 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Brewbaker motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 67 Abs: 17) [FAIL]
2018-02-06 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-06 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2018-189. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Enrolled |
2018-03-06 | House | Signature Requested |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Second House Concurs in Executive Amendment |
2018-03-01 | House | Ingram motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 579 |
2018-03-01 | House | House of Origin Concurs in Executive Amendment |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Brewbaker motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 503 |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Executive Amendment Offered |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Forwarded to Governor |
2018-02-20 | House | Signature Requested |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Enrolled |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2018-02-15 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 341 |
2018-02-15 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2018-02-13 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2018-02-06 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 283 |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Waggoner motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation |