AL SB158 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-20 - Pending third reading on day 20 Favorable from Transportation, Utilities and Infrastructure
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-20 - Pending third reading on day 20 Favorable from Transportation, Utilities and Infrastructure
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Permanent Joint Legislative Committee on Energy Policy, membership and duties revised, fund created for deposit of funds, creation fo office deleted, Secs. 29-2-270 to 29-2-275, inclusive, am'd.
Title
Permanent Joint Legislative Committee on Energy Policy, membership and duties revised, fund created for deposit of funds, creation fo office deleted, Secs. 29-2-270 to 29-2-275, inclusive, am'd.
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Ward [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-16 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - Senate - Ward motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - Senate - Ward motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-20 | House | Pending third reading on day 20 Favorable from Transportation, Utilities and Infrastructure |
2017-04-20 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2017-03-16 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Transportation, Utilities and Infrastructure |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Engrossed |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 404 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Ward motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 403 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Transportation and Energy Amendment Offered |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Transportation and Energy |