AL SB158 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-09 - Delivered to Governor at 11:45 p.m. on June 9, 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Municipalities, neighborhood infrastructure authorities, establishment by homeowners and business owners authorized, to manage and coordinate financing for neighborhood projects, tax credits, Neighborhood Infrastructure Incentive Plan Act (2011-20524)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Municipalities, neighborhood infrastructure authorities, establishment by homeowners and business owners authorized, to manage and coordinate financing for neighborhood projects, tax credits, Neighborhood Infrastructure Incentive Plan Act (2011-20524)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-06-09 - Senate - Pittman motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-06-09 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-06-09 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2011-06-09 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-06-09 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2011-03-31 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-03-31 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-06-09 Delivered to Governor at 11:45 p.m. on June 9, 2011
2011-06-09 County and Municipal Government first Amendment Offered
2011-06-09 Assigned Act No. 2011-689.
2011-06-09 Signature Requested
2011-06-09 Enrolled
2011-06-09 Concurred in Second House Amendment
2011-06-09 Pittman motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1070
2011-06-09 Concurrence Requested
2011-06-09 Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1162
2011-06-09 Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1161
2011-06-09 McMillan Amendment Offered
2011-06-09 Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1160
2011-06-09 County and Municipal Government Amendment Offered
2011-06-09 Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1159
2011-06-09 County and Municipal Government first Substitute Offered
2011-06-09 Third Reading Passed
2011-04-26 Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and 1 amendment
2011-03-31 Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on County and Municipal Government
2011-03-31 Engrossed
2011-03-31 Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 154
2011-03-31 Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 153
2011-03-31 Pittman first Substitute Offered
2011-03-31 Third Reading Passed
2011-03-24 Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
2011-03-03 Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Small Business

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/SESSBillResult.ASPX?WIN_TYPE=BillResult&BILL=SB158
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2011RS/PrintFiles/SB158-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2011RS/PrintFiles/SB158-eng.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2011RS/PrintFiles/SB158-enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=401212&VOTE=153&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1058&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=401213&VOTE=154&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1058&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=421890&VOTE=1159&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1058&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=421892&VOTE=1160&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1058&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=421894&VOTE=1161&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1058&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=421895&VOTE=1162&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1058&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=422043&VOTE=1070&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1058&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback