AL SB157 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-07 - Delivered to Governor at 9:01 p.m. on May 7, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

General Fund budget, appropriations for other functions of government, debt service, and capital outlay for fiscal year ending September 30, 2021.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

General Fund budget, appropriations for other functions of government, debt service, and capital outlay for fiscal year ending September 30, 2021.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-07 - Senate - Albritton motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-05-07 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 75 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 29) [PASS]
2020-05-07 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 29) [PASS]
2020-05-07 - House - Clouse motion to Table (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 29) [PASS]
2020-05-05 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-05-05 - Senate - Albritton motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-05-05 - Senate - Coleman-Madison motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-05-05 - Senate - Albritton motion to Table (Y: 17 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-05-05 - Senate - Albritton motion to Adopt (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-05-05 - Senate - Albritton motion to Adopt (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-07SenateDelivered to Governor at 9:01 p.m. on May 7, 2020
2020-05-07SenateAssigned Act No. 2020-168.
2020-05-07HouseSignature Requested
2020-05-07SenateEnrolled
2020-05-07HouseConcurred in Second House Amendment
2020-05-07SenateAlbritton motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 616
2020-05-07SenateConcurrence Requested
2020-05-07HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 483
2020-05-07HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 482
2020-05-07HouseClouse Amendment Offered
2020-05-07HouseClouse motion to Table adopted Roll Call 481
2020-05-07HouseWays and Means General Fund Amendment Offered
2020-05-07HouseThird Reading Passed
2020-05-06HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2020-05-05SenateEngrossed
2020-05-05HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means General Fund
2020-05-05SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 462
2020-05-05SenateAlbritton motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 461
2020-05-05SenateAlbritton Amendment Offered
2020-05-05SenateColeman-Madison motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 460
2020-05-05SenateColeman-Madison Amendment Offered
2020-05-05SenateAlbritton motion to Table adopted Roll Call 459
2020-05-05SenateSessions Amendment Offered
2020-05-05SenateAlbritton motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 458
2020-05-05SenateAlbritton Amendment Offered
2020-05-05SenateAlbritton motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 457
2020-05-05SenateFinance and Taxation General Fund first Substitute Offered
2020-05-05SenateThird Reading Passed
2020-05-04SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and
2020-02-06SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/Alison/SESSBillStatusResult.aspx?BILL=SB157&WIN_TYPE=SELECTED_STATUS
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2020RS/PrintFiles/SB157-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2020RS/PrintFiles/SB157-eng.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2020RS/PrintFiles/SB157-enr.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2020RS/PrintFiles/206835-1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2020RS/PrintFiles/207123-1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2020RS/PrintFiles/207143-1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2020RS/PrintFiles/207165-1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2020RS/PrintFiles/207169-1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2020RS/PrintFiles/207204-2.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2020RS/PrintFiles/207289-2.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=638411&VOTE=457&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1076&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=638510&VOTE=458&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1076&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=638512&VOTE=459&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1076&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=638514&VOTE=460&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1076&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=638516&VOTE=461&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1076&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=638517&VOTE=462&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1076&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=639798&VOTE=481&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1076&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=639800&VOTE=482&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1076&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=639813&VOTE=483&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1076&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=639989&VOTE=616&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1076&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback