AL SB157 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-06 - Assigned Act No. 2018-188.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-06 - Assigned Act No. 2018-188.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Motor Vehicle Franchise Act, unfair and deceptive trade practices, coercion of dealer to change or modify premises when unreasonable, further provided for, Sec. 8-20-4 am'd.
Title
Motor Vehicle Franchise Act, unfair and deceptive trade practices, coercion of dealer to change or modify premises when unreasonable, further provided for, Sec. 8-20-4 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-01 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-06 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2018-188. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Enrolled |
2018-03-06 | House | Signature Requested |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2018-03-01 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 556 |
2018-03-01 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2018-02-22 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2018-02-08 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Commerce and Small Business |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Engrossed |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 336 |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 335 |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Judiciary first Substitute Offered |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary |