AL SB156 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-27 - Forwarded to Governor on February 27, 2018 at 4:00 p.m. on February 27, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Sales and use taxes, exemption for sales of gold bullions, money, etc, Secs. 40-23-4, 40-23-62 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sales and use taxes, exemption for sales of gold bullions, money, etc, Secs. 40-23-4, 40-23-62 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-22 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 5 N: 13 NV: 3 Abs: 13) [FAIL]
2018-01-30 - Senate - Chambliss motion to Adopt (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - House - Johnson (R) Local Application (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 32 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 21 Abs: 19) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-27SenateForwarded to Governor on February 27, 2018 at 4:00 p.m. on February 27, 2018
2018-02-27SenateAssigned Act No. 2018-164.
2018-02-27SenateEnrolled
2018-02-27HouseSignature Requested
2018-02-27SenatePassed Second House
2018-02-22HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 443
2018-02-22HouseThird Reading Passed
2018-02-15HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2018-02-08HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education
2018-02-08SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 349
2018-02-08SenateThird Reading Passed
2018-02-01SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2018-01-11SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation Education

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/Alison/SESSBillStatusResult.aspx?BILL=SB156&WIN_TYPE=SELECTED_STATUS
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/SB156-int.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=586862&VOTE=349&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=590307&VOTE=443&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=581069&VOTE=8&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=581073&VOTE=9&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=584320&VOTE=185&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=584321&VOTE=186&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback