AL SB153 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Health
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Health
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Medical care, minors, requires doctors to obtain consent of parent or legal guardian of minor prior to entering "do not attempt resuscitation order" order, Sec. 22-8A-18 added; Sec. 22-8A-7 am'd.
Title
Medical care, minors, requires doctors to obtain consent of parent or legal guardian of minor prior to entering "do not attempt resuscitation order" order, Sec. 22-8A-18 added; Sec. 22-8A-7 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-05 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Livingston motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Livingston motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Health |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Engrossed |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 315 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Livingston motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 314 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Healthcare Amendment Offered |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Healthcare |