AL SB153 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-15 - Pending third reading on day 21 Favorable from Education Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-15 - Pending third reading on day 21 Favorable from Education Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
County Superintendent of Education, prohibition against additional employment removed, Sec. 16-9-12 am'd.
Title
County Superintendent of Education, prohibition against additional employment removed, Sec. 16-9-12 am'd.
Sponsors
Sen. Tim Melson [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-06 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-15 | House | Pending third reading on day 21 Favorable from Education Policy |
2018-03-15 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2018-03-06 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Education Policy |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 612 |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Education and Youth Affairs |