AL SB151 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-20 - Assigned Act No. 2014-275.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Bestiality and possession of obscene matter depicting bestiality, crime established, penalties

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Bestiality and possession of obscene matter depicting bestiality, crime established, penalties

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-03-19 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-03-20HouseAssigned Act No. 2014-275.
2014-03-20HouseSignature Requested
2014-03-20SenateEnrolled
2014-03-20SenatePassed Second House
2014-03-20HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 941
2014-03-20HouseThird Reading Passed
2014-03-20HouseMOTION TO SUSPEND RULES ADOPTED
2014-02-20HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2014-01-30HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary
2014-01-30SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 226
2014-01-30SenateThird Reading Passed
2014-01-15SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2014-01-14SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback