AL SB151 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-14 - Delivered to Governor at 5:05 p.m. on April 14, 2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-14 - Delivered to Governor at 5:05 p.m. on April 14, 2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Controlled substances, prescription drug monitoring program, meetings of Controlled Substances Prescription Database Advisory Committee, members authorized to meet electronically and by proxy, out-of-state access to prescription drug monitoring database authorized, State Board of Health authorized to use fees for database operations, Secs. 20-2-212, 20-2-214, 20-2-217 am'd.; Act 2009-489, 2009 Reg. Sess. am'd.
Title
Controlled substances, prescription drug monitoring program, meetings of Controlled Substances Prescription Database Advisory Committee, members authorized to meet electronically and by proxy, out-of-state access to prescription drug monitoring database authorized, State Board of Health authorized to use fees for database operations, Secs. 20-2-212, 20-2-214, 20-2-217 am'd.; Act 2009-489, 2009 Reg. Sess. am'd.
Sponsors
Sen. Larry Dixon [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-14 | Delivered to Governor at 5:05 p.m. on April 14, 2010 | |
2010-04-14 | Assigned Act No. 2010-539. | |
2010-04-14 | Signature Requested | |
2010-04-14 | Enrolled | |
2010-04-14 | Passed Second House | |
2010-04-14 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1068 | |
2010-04-14 | Third Reading Passed | |
2010-04-14 | Guin to suspend rules to take up out of order adopted voice vote | |
2010-03-03 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2010-02-16 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Health | |
2010-02-16 | Engrossed | |
2010-02-11 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 153 | |
2010-02-11 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 152 | |
2010-02-11 | Governmental Affairs Amendment Offered | |
2010-02-11 | Third Reading Passed | |
2010-02-02 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment | |
2010-01-12 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs |