AL SB15 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-09 - Pending third reading on day 29 Favorable from Constitution, Campaigns and Elections with 1 amendment
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-09 - Pending third reading on day 29 Favorable from Constitution, Campaigns and Elections with 1 amendment
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Elections, political parties and independent candidates for statewide office, number of names required to gain ballot access, reduced, Secs. 17-6-22, 17-9-3 am'd.
Title
Elections, political parties and independent candidates for statewide office, number of names required to gain ballot access, reduced, Secs. 17-6-22, 17-9-3 am'd.
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Ward [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-04-29 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-04-29 - Senate - Ward motion to Adopt (Y: 25 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2012-04-29 - Senate - Ward motion to Adopt (Y: 25 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-09 | Pending third reading on day 29 Favorable from Constitution, Campaigns and Elections with 1 amendment | |
2012-05-09 | Constitution, Campaigns and Elections first Amendment Offered | |
2012-05-09 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment | |
2012-04-26 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Constitution, Campaigns and Elections | |
2012-04-26 | Engrossed | |
2012-04-26 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 782 | |
2012-04-26 | Ward motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 781 | |
2012-04-26 | Ward Amendment Offered | |
2012-04-26 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-02-14 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2012-02-07 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Constitution, Campaign Finance, Ethics, and Elections |